BLURTON FARM RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1120884
Charity reporting is overdue by 599 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 599 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 599 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 March 2019 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 20 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required