Financial history BLURTON FARM RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1120884
Charity reporting is overdue by 499 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £33.47k £1.10k £5.24k £150 £411
Total expenditure £28.37k £7.78k £5.76k £1.63k £430
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A