BROWNEDGE RC PRIMARY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1119784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.49k £2.74k £3.87k £238.68k £1.41k
Total expenditure £2.19k £1.59k £2.95k £228.97k £1.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A