MSIZI AFRICA

Charity number: 1119525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £50.92k £88.36k £45.33k £86.62k £55.37k
Total expenditure £74.95k £45.48k £52.89k £72.32k £70.61k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A