ENFIELD COMMUNITY SUPPORT CENTRE

Charity number: 1126285
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 October 2020 10 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 October 2019 17 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 October 2018 17 June 2020 317 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 October 2017 15 June 2020 680 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 October 2016 15 June 2020 1045 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2016 Not Required