ENFIELD COMMUNITY SUPPORT CENTRE

Charity number: 1126285
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/10/2016 05/10/2017 05/10/2018 05/10/2019 05/10/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £475
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £475
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A