THE LADY ROTHES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1119157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 17 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 06 February 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 06 February 2020 1 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 08 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 08 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 02 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 02 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 02 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 02 February 2017 On time Download