Financial history HILDA LANE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1118937
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £29.98k £42.99k £38.66k £51.65k £47.56k
Total expenditure £50.48k £50.98k £35.46k £44.44k £63.11k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £12.77k £8.00k