Trustees ST PAUL'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 1119619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Tuffney Trustee 31 October 2022
None on record
John Andrew Fenwick Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Professor Joanne Harris Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Rupert Tate Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Rt. Hon Edward Henry Butler Vaizey Trustee 01 January 2022
COMMON SENSE MEDIA
Received: 15 days late
Aisha Sanusi Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Tom Modupe Adeyoola Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Veryan Jane Exelby Trustee 01 July 2020
DOWNE HOUSE SCHOOL
Received: On time
Samuel George Anthony Newhouse Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
RICHARD ALEXANDER CASSELL Trustee 09 January 2020
SYRACUSE UNIVERSITY (USA) LONDON PROGRAM
Received: On time
HAROLD ARTHUR HAMPSON Trustee 09 January 2020
None on record
Sarah Joan Thomas Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Timothy Hugh Penzer Haynes Trustee 01 March 2019
SHREWSBURY SCHOOL
Received: On time
HUGH NETTLEFOLD TRUST
Received: On time
SKINNERS' EDUCATION FOUNDATION
Recently registered
ALISON PALMER Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
LORD ANTHONY STEPHEN GRABINER QC Trustee 11 March 2015
None on record
Sarah Anne Barker Trustee 11 March 2015
None on record