Accounts and annual returns MK YIS

Charity number: 1120074
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 31 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 31 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 December 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 26 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window