Financial history MK YIS

Charity number: 1120074
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is overdue by 30 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £48.75k £87.27k £159.69k £177.04k £135.27k
Total expenditure £64.26k £68.81k £100.79k £126.95k £189.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £50.00k £50.00k £50.00k