BLAEN BRAN COMMUNITY WOODLAND

Charity number: 1120995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £17.59k £18.85k £6.07k £3.13k £2.74k
Total expenditure £18.00k £23.72k £6.88k £6.29k £1.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.00k £13.00k N/A N/A N/A