THE GREATER MANCHESTER CHURCHES PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity number: 1119834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £3.56k £3.29k £2.94k £3.04k £2.98k
Total expenditure £4.13k £3.23k £2.56k £2.09k £3.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A