SKIDDAW HOUSE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1119402
Charity reporting is overdue by 35 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £5.13k £20.91k £11.24k £914 £985
Total expenditure £7.11k £7.84k £8.42k £7.64k £7.18k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A