THE SEBASTIAN HUNTER MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1119191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 25/03/2016 25/03/2017 25/03/2018 25/03/2019 25/03/2020
Total gross income £106.65k £79.26k £55.55k £42.39k £35.18k
Total expenditure £111.29k £66.20k £50.42k £32.74k £33.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A