CHESTERFIELD TIME BANK

Charity number: 1122996
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £13.42k £25.75k £14.12k £7.29k £5.48k
Total expenditure £38.19k £25.09k £14.73k £11.51k £2.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A