CHESTERFIELD TIME BANK

Charity number: 1122996
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Mellor Trustee 13 July 2017 None on record
Steven Raison Trustee 13 July 2017 None on record
Jane Woodward Trustee 10 June 2018 None on record
JOHN PHILIP HICKEN Trustee 04 May 2011 None on record
Susan Schwalowsky-Monks Trustee 31 July 2013 None on record
Mick Crossley Chair 13 July 2017 None on record
JOHN ALEXANDER CURBBUN Trustee None on record
Mark Frith Trustee 18 June 2019 None on record