Accounts and annual returns THE UNIVERSITY OF BEDFORDSHIRE ECUMENICAL CHAPLAINCY TRUST

Charity number: 1119414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 11 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 11 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 24 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 24 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 21 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 21 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 27 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 27 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 21 September 2018 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 21 September 2018 113 days late Download Open in new window