Financial history THE UNIVERSITY OF BEDFORDSHIRE ECUMENICAL CHAPLAINCY TRUST

Charity number: 1119414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £45.17k £44.95k £44.45k £44.88k £33.90k
Total expenditure £35.74k £44.97k £40.69k £39.86k £35.23k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A