Financial history EXETER CITY COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1121596
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £1.43m £1.53m £1.51m £1.12m £1.66m
Total expenditure £1.44m £1.49m £1.45m £939.94k £1.41m
Income from government contracts £0 £575.11k £557.83k £243.92k N/A
Income from government grants £43.15k £8.90k £4.98k N/A £288.83k
Income - Donations and legacies £24.64k £305.11k £304.82k £567.71k £922.20k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £10.90k £0 £10.08k
Income - Charitable activities £1.17m £1.22m £1.19m £548.29k £721.07k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.91k £3.10k £3.32k £2.13k £2.10k
Income - Other £241.25k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.44m £1.44m £1.45m £877.23k £1.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £43.90k £0 £62.72k £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.63k £6.31k £0 £7.50k £11.47k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £3.46k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0