Trustees EXETER CITY COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity number: 1121596
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIAN TAGG BEM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sanjana Truran | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sunny Truran | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Craig Newbery-Jones | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Kirk | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Matthew Lee Davey | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Wynford Marsh | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ross Morshead | Trustee | 03 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul James Goodes | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.