SRI GANGAMATA GAUDIYA MATH

Charity number: 1123514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 02 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 04 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 19 May 2017 On time Download