SRI GANGAMATA GAUDIYA MATH

Charity number: 1123514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £60.27k £60.98k £72.83k £130.34k £166.84k
Total expenditure £61.02k £58.21k £66.48k £82.76k £89.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £25.08k