Accounts and annual returns ENRYCH OXFORDSHIRE

Charity number: 1119954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 05 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 24 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window