Financial history ENRYCH OXFORDSHIRE

Charity number: 1119954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £29.27k £54.39k £48.23k £51.71k £39.71k
Total expenditure £49.14k £40.24k £35.79k £54.05k £48.93k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £10.00k N/A £10.00k £16.12k