ALMIS WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1120660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 May 2020 11 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2019 26 May 2020 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2018 20 April 2019 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2017 10 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2016 25 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2016 Not Required