ST MARY'S JACOBITE SYRIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH

Charity number: 1121608
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £15.76k £10.39k £12.15k £16.50k £17.20k
Total expenditure £8.10k £12.02k £10.52k £10.59k £8.67k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A