GARGRAVE AGRICULTURAL AND HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY LTD

Charity number: 1121555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £32.37k £35.58k £36.53k £35.75k £3.55k
Total expenditure £41.53k £38.42k £34.20k £33.50k £4.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A