CXK LIMITED

Charity number: 1120755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £11.64m £12.43m £8.83m £6.07m £7.04m
Total expenditure £11.95m £12.60m £9.13m £6.80m £6.90m
Income from government contracts £11.61m £12.40m £5.02m £3.80m £6.69m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £10.56k £11.37k £15.60k £5.48k £11
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £11.61m £12.40m £8.79m £6.03m £6.97m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £22.55k £21.70k £22.47k £29.26k £67.19k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.95m £12.60m £9.13m £6.80m £6.90m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £32.33k £0 £44.97k £28.22k £32.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0