CXK LIMITED

Charity number: 1120755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Vernon Trustee 16 May 2018
MEDWAY YOUTH TRUST Received: On time
Richard Edward Fedorcio OBE Chair 09 December 2013
THE HEART OF KENT HOSPICE Received: On time
Active Partnerships Received: On time
Sonette Andrea Schwartz Trustee 01 March 2017 None on record
Robert Rose Trustee 12 March 2020 None on record
Dominic John Hilleard Trustee 16 May 2018
MEDWAY YOUTH TRUST Received: On time
Charlotte Marie Walshe Trustee 01 March 2017 None on record
Pauline Smith Trustee 01 February 2017 None on record
Domini Jane Bucknell Trustee 11 March 2021 None on record
David Yates Trustee 12 March 2020 None on record
Joanna Pamela Boraston Trustee 11 March 2021 None on record
Alexander Graeme Dykes Trustee 16 May 2018 None on record
Robert Christian Robinson Trustee 01 March 2017 None on record
KELLY AMBER FREEMAN Trustee 01 March 2017 None on record