Financial history THE NATIONAL CHURCHES TRUST

Charity number: 1119845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.59m £2.34m £2.42m £2.27m £2.13m
Total expenditure £2.31m £2.66m £2.38m £2.33m £2.77m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £17.00k £18.53k £20.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.53m £2.19m £2.21m £2.08m £1.75m
Income - Other trading activities £24.74k £35.06k £60.79k £75.68k £61.02k
Income - Charitable activities £3.50k £4.45k £4.19k £435 £5.60k
Income - Endowments £92.00k £37.25k £60.45k £25.10k £25.00k
Income - Investment £123.19k £154.23k £146.06k £144.56k £153.45k
Income - Other £0 £0 £15.40k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £513.36k £1.41m £928.70k £778.44k £159.43k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.98m £2.32m £1.76m £1.70m £2.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £331.25k £346.42k £619.80k £633.13k £540.39k
Expenditure - Governance £24.80k £22.53k £29.69k £29.85k £31.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.40m £1.69m £1.20m £1.29m £1.68m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0