Accounts and annual returns OLDHAM MADANI ACADEMY

Charity number: 1120937
Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 86 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 86 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 05 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 05 April 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 05 April 2023 340 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 05 April 2023 340 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 03 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 08 October 2020 161 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 October 2020 161 days late Download Open in new window