Financial history STAFFORD TOWN FOOTBALL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1121304
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £697.31k £3.79k £2.88k £2.75k £1.39k
Total expenditure £99.06k £99.67k £99.15k £98.52k £98.52k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.40k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £694.40k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £2.72k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £196 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £99.06k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A