Financial history THE AFRICAN CONSERVATION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1120705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £77.17k £49.31k £15.36k £27.01k £13.56k
Total expenditure £78.81k £56.76k £54.09k £18.97k £11.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A