LONDON GOOD NEWS CHURCH LIMITED

Charity number: 1119980
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 03 September 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 02 October 2020 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 01 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 09 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 20 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required