Financial history MARSH LADIES CHOIR

Charity number: 1121233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £17.30k £6.06k £18.47k £10.33k £8.29k
Total expenditure £19.66k £7.20k £18.68k £8.17k £2.84k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A