INFECTION PREVENTION SOCIETY

Charity number: 1120063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.07m £968.53k £1.01m £814.61k £818.19k
Total expenditure £1.02m £1.04m £1.20m £971.63k £790.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £187.81k £12.41k £13.88k £11.78k £10.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £874.62k £952.85k £980.52k £791.92k £797.39k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.36k £3.27k £11.26k £10.90k £10.80k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £966.53k £1.03m £1.19m £962.60k £783.92k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £4.80k £11.02k £9.03k £7.02k
Expenditure - Governance £46.68k £47.77k £63.36k £62.16k £54.88k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £4.47k £4.80k £11.02k £9.03k £7.02k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0