Trustees ST JUDE INDIA CHILDCARE CENTRES UNITED KINGDOM (SJICC UK)

Charity number: 1120539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Krishna Shanmuganathan Chair 25 May 2016
SOLEFIELD SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Mona Dhir Trustee 10 March 2021
None on record
Rita Shankardass Trustee 31 July 2019
None on record
MANISA JAIN Trustee 09 May 2017
None on record
Poonam Mittal Trustee 17 June 2015
None on record
MRS ALICE CHARLOTTE STEPHENS-HODGE Trustee 09 March 2015
None on record
Dr MALLIKA KAVIRATNE Trustee 07 February 2013
None on record
Dr BRIAN JOHN HARGREAVES Trustee
None on record