Financial history HAYES GREEN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1120117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £31.98k £12.49k £33.31k £32.11k £45.95k
Total expenditure £32.70k £35.82k £34.58k £16.05k £31.43k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.00k £4.00k £20.46k £20.77k £14.85k