Trustees HAYES GREEN COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity number: 1120117

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor John Bernard | Chair | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARK BIRCH | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Laura Harrison | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Howell | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Foster | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Foster | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Stephanie Heath | Trustee | 22 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Tyrell | Trustee | 22 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Ruth Howell | Trustee | 22 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Councillor Diane Todd | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.