PORTSMOUTH MUSLIM ACADEMY

Charity number: 1119906
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 May 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 30 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 31 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 31 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 31 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 31 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 31 March 2017 On time Download