PORTSMOUTH MUSLIM ACADEMY

Charity number: 1119906
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £43.01k £28.75k £23.29k £15.52k £12.90k
Total expenditure £13.75k £16.92k £22.93k £14.34k £12.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A