Financial history ACTIVITIES 4 CHILDREN (SHEFFIELD)LIMITED

Charity number: 1120466
Charity reporting is overdue by 1407 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2013 31/05/2014 31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017
Total gross income £41.38k £9.80k £8.23k £6.75k £8.45k
Total expenditure £32.27k £9.60k £8.00k £6.30k £7.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A