THE GOLDMAN SACHS CHARITABLE GIFT FUND (UK)

Charity number: 1120148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £1.03m £1.52m £3.09m £2.28m £4.21m
Total expenditure £1.20m £1.36m £1.83m £1.97m £2.08m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.01m £1.48m £3.01m £2.13m £4.09m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £18.86k £42.64k £77.98k £152.31k £119.98k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.16m £1.31m £1.78m £1.92m £2.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds £37.12k £47.31k £49.24k £54.32k £57.58k
Expenditure - Governance £148.57k £110.46k £123.42k £110.22k £123.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £936.26k £1.10m £1.59m £1.70m £1.79m
Expenditure - Investment management £37.12k £47.31k £49.24k £54.32k £57.58k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0