JEWISH RESCUE & RELIEF COMMITTEE OF AGUDAS ISRAEL WORLD ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1120311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £44.17k £48.77k £32.56k £35.24k £33.35k
Total expenditure £37.73k £50.94k £30.82k £35.72k £33.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A