Financial history PICTURE PEOPLE

Charity number: 1125716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £1.26k £15.49k £26.22k £29.74k £35.89k
Total expenditure £6.46k £5.29k £9.51k £29.06k £47.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.38k