THE FRIENDS OF SAINT STEPHEN ON THE CLIFFS BLACKPOOL

Charity number: 1120454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTOPHER NORTON Trustee 01 June 2015 None on record
PAMELA BRYANT Trustee 30 April 2015 None on record
DOROTHY GRAHAM Trustee 18 September 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN ON THE CLIFFS, BLACKPOOL Received: On time
JENNIFER GREEN Trustee 05 April 2016 None on record
ALAN NORTON Trustee 10 October 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN ON THE CLIFFS, BLACKPOOL Received: On time
IAN BUTTERWORTH Trustee 29 April 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN ON THE CLIFFS, BLACKPOOL Received: On time
LORNA JEFFREY Trustee 30 June 2015 None on record
Rev Richard Thornburgh Trustee 05 September 2019 None on record
GEORGE MALCOLM WILCOCK Trustee 16 December 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN ON THE CLIFFS, BLACKPOOL Received: On time