COLNE OPEN DOOR CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1121144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £143.76k £141.04k £117.01k £89.57k £171.78k
Total expenditure £119.21k £147.04k £129.37k £128.35k £107.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £5.00k £5.00k £5.00k
Income from government grants £5.00k £15.00k N/A N/A £21.25k