FAITH AND HEALTH PROMOTION ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1121700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £17.88k £12.21k £17.27k £19.00k £16.11k
Total expenditure £18.06k £11.99k £16.55k £17.50k £14.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A