EATON MILL PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1120986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 14 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 14 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 03 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 03 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 20 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 20 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 22 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 01 March 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2015 24 March 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 18 April 2016 On time Download